judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

COLUMBIA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MALONEY JR., JAMES P.

Case Information: 85-CV-1370
Short Caption:COLUMBIA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY MALONEY JR., JAMES P.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:MISC49-85Filed Date:08/22/1985

Opening Event Date:08/22/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/16/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/27/1986
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Mark W. FosterNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Stephen H. Glickman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
M. Paul Zimmerman YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLUMBIA CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC. MALONEY JR., JAMES P.
08/22/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/16/1985FiledRecord Completed
02/27/1986FiledBriefing Completed
05/28/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition