Case: 14-83-00855-CV
14-83-00855-CV
12/21/1983
Miscellaneous civil
Casale, Robert
Nelson, Mattie B. And Barmore, John
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/26/1984 | Case stored | | |
07/24/1984 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/27/1984 | Higher Court Decision | No Reversible Error | |
05/14/1984 | Writ of Error FILED | | |
04/12/1984 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
04/04/1984 | Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA | | |
03/30/1984 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
03/15/1984 | Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA | GRANTED | |
03/15/1984 | Opinion issued | DISMISSED | |
02/17/1984 | Motion to dismiss filed | | |
02/09/1984 | No description available. | GRANTED | |
01/23/1984 | No description available. | | |
01/05/1984 | No description available. | GRANTED | |
12/22/1983 | Letter from atty with address change | | |
12/22/1983 | No description available. | | |
12/21/1983 | Transcript FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/26/1984 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellant | |
Mannesman Piper & Steel Corporation | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
79-12062