Case: 10-83-00324-CV
10-83-00324-CV
12/20/1983
Miscellaneous civil
Debra Ann Woods
Raymond Donald Shropshire
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/13/2001 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
06/12/1984 | Case stored | | |
06/12/1984 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
04/26/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/09/1984 | Submitted | | |
12/20/1983 | Notice of Appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/13/2001 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
40th District Court
Ellis
38,002