Case: 05-98-02113-CV
05-98-02113-CV
12/22/1998
Interlocutory
City of Dallas, City of Dallas Parks & Recreation Dept., City of Dallas Parks & Recreation Board and Paul Dyer, Director
W. Dale Robinson, Dr. Mary Ellen Bluntzer and Dallas Citizens for the Protection of City Parks
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/01/2018 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
06/27/2018 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
05/08/2001 | Return to storage | | |||
02/01/2001 | Pulled from storage | | |||
03/30/2000 | Exhibits returned | | |||
02/03/2000 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
02/01/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
02/01/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |||
01/24/2000 | Letter Filed | | |||
12/27/1999 | Petition for Review Filed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||
11/01/1999 | Motion for Relief Filed | Overruled | | ||
11/01/1999 | Petition for Review Filed | | |||
10/22/1999 | Jurisdictional Brief Filed | | |||
10/19/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
10/18/1999 | 10.00 Fee Due | | |||
10/18/1999 | Order Entered | | |||
10/18/1999 | Response to Motion | | |||
10/13/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
10/13/1999 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
10/08/1999 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
10/07/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
10/07/1999 | Response to Motion | | |||
10/04/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
10/04/1999 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
09/16/1999 | Motion for Leave to File | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
09/16/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
09/16/1999 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
08/31/1999 | Response to Motion | | |||
08/31/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
08/24/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
08/24/1999 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
08/17/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
08/17/1999 | Response to Motion | | |||
08/04/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
08/04/1999 | Motion for Leave to File | | |||
07/23/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
07/23/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |||
07/23/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
07/08/1999 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
07/08/1999 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
06/02/1999 | Submitted | | |||
06/02/1999 | Submission | | |||
06/02/1999 | Submitted | | |||
04/13/1999 | Letter Filed | | |||
04/13/1999 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
03/29/1999 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/29/1999 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/29/1999 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/24/1999 | Order Entered | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/23/1999 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
03/23/1999 | Motion to Strike Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
03/17/1999 | Submission | | |||
03/08/1999 | Response to Motion | | |||
03/05/1999 | 10.00 Fee Paid | | |||
03/05/1999 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |||
03/05/1999 | Motion to Strike | | |||
03/05/1999 | Reply Brief Filed | | |||
02/24/1999 | Brief Filed | | |||
02/24/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/24/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |||
02/23/1999 | Record Returned | | |||
02/22/1999 | Letter Filed | | |||
02/02/1999 | Record Checked Out | | |||
01/29/1999 | Record Returned | | |||
01/28/1999 | Brief Due | | |||
01/28/1999 | Brief Filed | | |||
01/27/1999 | Record Checked Out | | |||
01/13/1999 | Exhibits Filed | | |||
01/08/1999 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
01/08/1999 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |||
01/01/1999 | Record due | | |||
12/22/1998 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
12/22/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
12/22/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
12/22/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
12/17/1998 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/01/2018 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Renee Carroll | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Renee Carroll |
City Of Dallas, Et Al | Appellant | Ronald Stutes |
W. Dale Robinson | Appellee | James M. Murphy |
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
DV98-09055-A