judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARLOS YAMMON PENA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-15-0054)
Case Number:S-15-0054Case Docketed On:03/04/2015
Linked To: S-15-0055
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:CARLOS YAMMON PENA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CARLOS YAMMON PENA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCarlos Yammon PenaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
David L. Delicath
Jenny Lynn Craig
Joshua Charles Eames

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Probation, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2015 WY 149
Citation:361 P.3d 862

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/04/2015Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/04/2015Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/04/2015Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/21/2015Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/22/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received Appellant's Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/28/2015Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/29/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2015Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2015Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/06/2015Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/06/2015Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II - Original Papers; Volume III-IV - Transcripts; Volume - V - Confidential File.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2015Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/07/2015Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by David E. Westling obo appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/21/2015Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Jenny L. Craig obo of appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/12/2015Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Hill, Davis, Fox and Kautz (David E. Westling obo Appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig obo Appellee and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/24/2015Opinion - Opinion and journal order. Affirmed with Justice Hill writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/10/2015Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/10/2015Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/10/2015Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/10/2015Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/16/2015Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2) - Record signed for 12/14/2015.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal