Case: 03-90-00132-CV
03-90-00132-CV
05/29/1990
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Smith Motor Sales, Inc., Tom Benson Chevrolet, Inc. and Krueger Chevrolet, Inc.
Texas Motor Vehicle Commission, Gunn Chevrolet, Inc. and General Motors Corporation
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/20/2002 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
11/23/1993 | CASE STORED | | |
04/16/1992 | Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk | | |
04/14/1992 | Letter requesting pickup of exhibits | | |
01/08/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/25/1991 | Case returned from higher court | | |
10/23/1991 | Appl Writ to Supreme Court denied | Motion or Writ Denied | |
07/16/1991 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |
07/03/1991 | Writ of injunction filed | | |
06/05/1991 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
06/05/1991 | Motion to Strike Disposed | Dismissed | |
05/31/1991 | Response to Motion | | |
05/29/1991 | Motion to Strike Filed | | |
05/13/1991 | Certificate Filed | | |
05/09/1991 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
04/24/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/19/1991 | Letter received | | |
03/15/1991 | Post-submission brief filed | | |
03/13/1991 | Post-submission brief filed | | |
03/07/1991 | Post-submission brief filed | | |
03/06/1991 | Submitted | | |
03/06/1991 | Submission | | |
02/28/1991 | Correction filed | | |
01/30/1991 | Submission | | |
09/04/1990 | Reply brief filed | | |
08/22/1990 | Brief filed | | |
08/22/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/24/1990 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/23/1990 | Brief filed | | |
07/23/1990 | Brief filed | | |
07/23/1990 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
07/11/1990 | Exhibits filed | | |
07/11/1990 | Mt file Supplemental Statement of Facts disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/11/1990 | Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed | | |
06/28/1990 | Brief with appendix filed | | |
06/19/1990 | Supplemental Statement of Facts Received | | |
06/07/1990 | Mt file Supplemental Statement of FActs filed | | |
05/29/1990 | Attachments to transcript | | |
05/29/1990 | Exhibits received | | |
05/29/1990 | Transcript & SF Filed | | |
05/29/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/08/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Gunn Chevrolet, Inc. | Appellee | Mr. Lloyd E. Ferguson |
Smith Motor Sales, Inc. | Appellant | Mr. David R. Sapp |
Gunn Chevrolet, Inc., Et Al. | Appellee | Mr. William R. Crocker |
Texas Motor Vehicle Commission | Appellee | Ms. Cynthia Woelk |
Krueger Chevrolet, Inc. | Appellant | Mr. David R. Sapp |
General Motors Corporation | Appellee | Mr. Les Mendelsohn |
Tom Benson Chevrolet, Inc. | Appellant | Mr. David R. Sapp |
Trial Court Information
53rd District Court
Travis
Honorable Edward L. Jarrett
449,789