Case: 13-90-00207-CR
13-90-00207-CR
05/31/1990
Unknown Criminal Case Type.
Muniz, Richard
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/26/1990 | Mandate Issued | | |
09/20/1990 | ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come | | |
08/31/1990 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/31/1990 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
08/13/1990 | Letter sent | | |
08/06/1990 | Green card in | | |
07/31/1990 | 10 day letter sent | | |
07/24/1990 | Due date for record to be filed | | |
07/20/1990 | Transcript Filed | | |
07/13/1990 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
05/31/1990 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
05/31/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/26/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
Honorable Margarito Garza