Case: C-9902
C-9902
05/31/1990
See former TRAP 130(D)
SHARIF-MUNIR-DAVIDSON DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION ET AL.
CLAUDE D. BELL JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/04/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/16/1990 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
06/29/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/04/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/05/1990 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Rehearing Filed | | |
09/06/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
07/19/1990 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
07/19/1990 | No description available. | | | |
07/16/1990 | Reply to Response | | | |
07/09/1990 | Notice requesting filing fee | REPLY - $5.00 | | |
06/29/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | | |
05/31/1990 | Extension of time to file app writ err disposed of | Filing granted | | |
05/31/1990 | Extension of time to file app writ err filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No Rehearing Filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-89-01115-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW2d ___, 04-10-90
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Warren Whitham
Trial Court Information
68th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Gary Hall
87-15589-C