judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Clyde Lynn Wilson v. The State of Texas

Case: 05-81-01331-CR
05-81-01331-CR
12/21/1981
Burglary of a Building
Clyde Lynn Wilson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
10/07/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
08/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
01/06/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
08/17/1983Notice filed
08/17/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
05/18/1983Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
05/09/1983Letter issued by the court
05/05/1983Letter received
05/05/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
04/05/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/07/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/09/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/09/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/13/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/17/1982Clerks record filed
04/16/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
02/18/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
12/21/1981Docketing statement filed
12/21/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/05/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wilson, Clyde LynnCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 5
F81-30915-IL
Life TDC