Case: 02-0064
02-0064
01/23/2002
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE EVERSTAR MERCHANDISE CO., LTD.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/25/2002 | Motion for Rehearing | Refers to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | on behalf of Everstar Merchandise Co., LTD, also requesting rehearing on motio n for stay of trial setting (trial set for 1-28-02) | |
01/25/2002 | Response to Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | Real party in interests' response to relator's mo/re will mail signed orig (1/28/02 Orig. delivered by courier) | |
01/23/2002 | Appendix Filed | Relator | appendix incorporated in record (12) | |
01/23/2002 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | On behalf of Everstar Merchandise Co., Ltd. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/19/2002 | Case Stored | 22-B-5 | | |
02/19/2002 | Description of document returned to Supreme Court | for Mr. Drabek. Re-mailed to address in State Bar file. | | |
01/29/2002 | Document received (See Remarks) | Original signed copy of Correction received; Original signed copy of Respondent's Response to Rehearing received | | |
01/25/2002 | Conditional motion for rehearing | mandamus | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
01/25/2002 | Call received | call from atty's office stating that the word not should not be in a sentence in the motion, they are faxing a letter | | |
01/25/2002 | Correction filed (See Remarks) | Relator's correction to page 4 to the mo/re | | |
01/25/2002 | Motion for Rehearing | on behalf of Everstar Merchandise Co., LTD, also requesting rehearing on motio n for stay of trial setting (trial set for 1-28-02) | | |
01/25/2002 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | W/Justice Baker and Rodriguez not sitting. | |
01/25/2002 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | record remains in clerk's office | | |
01/25/2002 | Response to Motion for Rehearing | Real party in interests' response to relator's mo/re will mail signed orig (1/28/02 Orig. delivered by courier) | | |
01/24/2002 | Motion to Stay Disposed | Denied | W/Justice Baker and Rodriguez not sitting. | |
01/24/2002 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied | W/emergency motion for stay of trial setting denied. (Justice Baker and Rodriguez not sitting) | |
01/23/2002 | Motion to Stay Filed | Relator's motion to stay trial setting | | |
01/23/2002 | Appendix Filed | appendix incorporated in record (12) | | |
01/23/2002 | Clerk's Record | 12 copies of Clerk's Record filed with Mandamus | | |
01/23/2002 | Court reporter/recorder's record | 12 copies filed with Mandamus | | |
01/23/2002 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | On behalf of Everstar Merchandise Co., Ltd. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/19/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 22-B-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MORALES, JORGE EMMANUEL (MINOR | Respondent | Mr. Mark A. Cantu |
MORALES, ESTATE OF NEYBA SOLEY | Respondent | Mr. Rolando Cantu |
MORALES, ESTATE OF ANAYLEN SIL | Respondent | Mr. Mark A. Cantu |
GONZALEZ, NOE | Judge | Honorable Noe Gonzalez |
MORALES, CLAUDIA MARISOL (MINO | Respondent | Mr. Francisco Enriquez |
EVERSTAR MERCHANDISE CO., LTD. | Relator | Mr. Robert L. Guerra Ms. Rosemarie Kanusky Mr. Jose E. Garcia Mr. W. Wendell Hall |
BROADWAY HARDWARE | Respondent | Mr. Stephen D. Navarro |
WAL-MART STORES, INC. | Respondent | Mr. Jaime Drabek |
AVILA, MARIA ROSARIO | Respondent | Mr. Francisco Enriquez Mr. Glenn David Romero |
MORALES, ESTATE OF TANIA ELIZA | Respondent | Mr. Mark A. Cantu |
SANCHEZ, EDWARDO | Respondent | Mr. Rolando Cantu |
ALVAREZ, TANIA ELIZABETH SILVA | Other interested party | Ms. Shiree Danette Salinas |
AVILA, DIANA MARGARITA (MINOR) | Respondent | Mr. Julian Rodriguez Jr. |
ROMERO, MARTIN | Respondent | Mr. Francisco Enriquez |
ALVAREZ, MARIA DE LA LUZ MORAL | Respondent | Mr. Mark A. Cantu |
MORALES, ROSALINDA | Respondent | Mr. Rolando Cantu |
VENTURA, ABRAM | Respondent | Mr. Julian Rodriguez Jr. |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-01-00863-CV
Denied
RULE 47.7, 01-17-02
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
370th District Court
Hidalgo
Honorable Noe Gonzalez
C-837-01-G