Case Heading (S-15-0065) | |||||
Case Number: | S-15-0065 | Case Docketed On: | 03/19/2015 | ||
Linked To: | S-15-0066 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1) | ||
Short Title: | STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION v. JTL GROUP, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a KNIFE RIVER, | ||||
Full Title: | STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellant (Third Party Defendant), v. JTL GROUP, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, d/b/a KNIFE RIVER, Appellee (Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Department of Transportation | Peter K. Michael John D. Rossetti Jackson Matthew Engels |
Appellee | JTL Group, Inc. | David F. Evans Stefanie Lee Boster |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Appellate Procedure, Contracts, Immunity |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/19/2015 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/19/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/19/2015 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
03/19/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
03/19/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement and service of orders to David F. Evans, Stephanie Lee Boster and Marci Anne Crank Bramlet | Notice-Outgoing | E-filing requirement | Final | |
04/23/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Counsel for State notified Court that Anderson Highway Signs is not a party to this appeal, Judge's decision and order confirms. Caption amended and counsel notified. | Notice-Incoming | Other | Final | |
04/23/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - memo and corrected caption | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
05/04/2015 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
05/04/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Wyoming Department of Transportation | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/22/2015 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
06/22/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/30/2015 | Order for Supplemental Briefing | Order | Supplemental briefing - grant | Final | |
07/06/2015 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
07/13/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/14/2015 | Motion - Other - Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Oral Argument | Motion | Other | Final | |
07/15/2015 | Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Davis | Notice-Internal | Recusal memo | Final | |
07/15/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Oral Argument | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/15/2015 | Order - Vacating setting for oral argument | Order | Vacating setting for oral argument | Final | |
07/24/2015 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
07/24/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
07/30/2015 | Brief - Supplemental appellant | Brief | Supplemental appellant | Final | |
07/30/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - State of Wyoming's Supplemental Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/30/2015 | Brief - Supplemental appellee | Brief | Supplemental appellee | Final | |
07/31/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Supplemental Brief of JTL Group, Inc., a Wyoming Corporation, D/B/A Knife River | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/11/2015 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
09/17/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - received by Jackson M. Engels obo appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/21/2015 | Order - Assignment of judge/justice (John R. Perry) | Order | Assignment of judge/justice | Final | |
09/28/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Stefanie Boster obo Knife River | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
10/09/2015 | Motion - Dismiss - voluntary | Motion | Dismiss - voluntary | Final | |
10/09/2015 | Response/Objection - Motion | Response/Objection | Motion | Final | |
10/12/2015 | Order - Dismissing Appeals | Order | Dismissing | Final | |
10/12/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/28/2015 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
10/28/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
10/28/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
11/02/2015 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/30/2015. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |