Case: 01-83-00721-CV
01-83-00721-CV
10/21/1983
Contract
Yeates, Ronald
Carol McCall
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/29/1985 | No description available. | | |
01/28/1985 | Case file returned from higher Court or agency. | | |
01/16/1985 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
11/21/1984 | Petition for writ of error from trial court | Refused | |
09/28/1984 | Petition for writ of error from trial court | | |
08/28/1984 | No description available. | | |
07/12/1984 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
06/15/1984 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
05/31/1984 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/08/1984 | Submitted | | |
03/29/1984 | Submission | | |
03/12/1984 | Ape Br not filed notice tha case will be set | | |
12/19/1983 | Brief filed | | |
11/17/1983 | Motion to extend time to file state of facts disp | Grant motion | |
11/17/1983 | Statement of facts filed | | |
11/10/1983 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
10/27/1983 | Motion for leave to file | | |
10/27/1983 | Motion to extend time to file statement of facts | | |
10/21/1983 | Transcript filed | | |
10/20/1983 | Appeal bond filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/29/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Appellee | |
State | Appellant | |
State | Appellee | |
State | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 2
Harris
364,668