judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREENHOW, LARRY G. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CM-0730
Short Caption:GREENHOW, LARRY G. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M15581-82Filed Date:06/15/1983

Opening Event Date:06/15/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/02/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/27/1984
Argued/Submitted:03/07/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Richard K. Gilbert YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John M. Facciola YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GREENHOW, LARRY G. UNITED STATES
06/15/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/02/1984FiledRecord Completed
11/27/1984FiledBriefing Completed
03/07/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/11/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition