judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHAPPELL (WILLIAM) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33923
Short Caption:CHAPPELL (WILLIAM) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33719 , 34180
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C103968Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/02/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/22/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/22/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-02051
03/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. 99-02311
06/28/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Second Notice of Appeal. 99-05633
08/02/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 4. 99-07042
08/02/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/07/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that Chappell is not entitled to relief or an evidentiary hearing, and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-17303
11/01/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-17347
11/01/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 4, 2002. 02-17347