Case: A-1026
A-1026
08/28/1946
Application for Writ of Error
FRED P. HAYWARD, ET AL.
CITY OF CORPUS CHRISTI, REPUBLIC NATIONAL BANK OF DALLAS, TRUSTEE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/30/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
04/24/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
04/23/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
04/16/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
10/10/1946 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/30/1946 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
09/04/1946 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
08/28/1946 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
08/28/1946 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
08/28/1946 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/30/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | | ||
04/29/1947 | Motion to Amend Filed | Filing granted | | |
04/24/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | Filing granted | | |
04/23/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/16/1947 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
04/09/1947 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
10/10/1946 | Response to Petition | | ||
09/30/1946 | Response to Petition | | ||
09/04/1946 | Response to Petition | | ||
08/30/1946 | Motion for Extension of Time filed | Filing granted | | |
08/28/1946 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
08/28/1946 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
08/28/1946 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
08/28/1946 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
City of Corpus Christi | Respondent | |
Fred P. Hayward, et al. | Petitioner | |
Republic National Bank of Dallas, Trustee | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information