Case: 05-97-01521-CR
05-97-01521-CR
09/11/1997
Other Drug Sale
Whitfield, Oliver William
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/17/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/17/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/21/1999 | Ext to file Petition for Discretionary Review Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | |
07/14/1999 | Petition for discretionary review was not filed | | |
06/08/1999 | Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/30/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/30/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/23/1999 | Submitted | | |
04/23/1999 | Submission | | |
04/23/1999 | Submitted | | |
04/22/1999 | Supplemental Brief Received | | |
03/29/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
03/19/1999 | Submission | | |
11/05/1998 | Letter Filed | | |
05/07/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/07/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/06/1998 | Brief Due | | |
04/06/1998 | Brief Filed | | |
04/06/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/03/1998 | Brief Received | | |
04/03/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/24/1998 | Notice To Appellant that Brief is late | | |
03/24/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
03/16/1998 | Brief Due | | |
02/24/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
02/19/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
02/16/1998 | Brief Due | | |
01/21/1998 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/20/1998 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/15/1998 | Brief Due | | |
12/17/1997 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/16/1997 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
12/13/1997 | Brief Due | | |
11/13/1997 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
11/04/1997 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
10/20/1997 | Record due | | |
09/11/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/21/1997 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | | |
08/21/1997 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/17/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Belinda Martin | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Belinda Baraka |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Kenneth Jefferson Bray |
Whitfield, Oliver William | Criminal - Appellant | Gary A. Udashen |
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Lance James Ramsey
F96-43807-R
2 Years & $5000 Fine