judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1025
A-1025
08/27/1946
Application for Writ of Error
ERVIN DAVIDSON, ET AL.
FRED WHITAKER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/16/1946Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/30/1946Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/06/1946Response to PetitionRespondent
08/28/1946Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/29/1946Response to Motion filed
11/16/1946Brief in Support of Petition
10/30/1946Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/30/1946Letter Filed
09/06/1946Response to Petition
08/28/1946Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/27/1946Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ervin Davidson, et al.Petitioner
Fred Whitaker, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information