judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALSTON, LAAQUANETTA M. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 84-CM-1519
Short Caption:ALSTON, LAAQUANETTA M. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8385-84Filed Date:10/26/1984

Opening Event Date:10/26/1984Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/08/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/05/1985
Argued/Submitted:09/27/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Enid HinkesYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Lizabeth A. Mckibben YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ALSTON, LAAQUANETTA M. UNITED STATES
10/26/1984FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/08/1985FiledRecord Completed
06/05/1985FiledBriefing Completed
09/27/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/26/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition