Case: 02-0228
02-0228
03/13/2002
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
BP AMOCO P.L.C., AMOCO CORPORATION, AMERADA HESS LIMITED, AMERADA HESS CORP., ENTERPRISE OIL, P.L.C., BP EXPLORATION OPERATING COMPANY, LTD., BP AMERICA, INC., AND AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY
ROWAN COMPANIES, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/13/2002 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to petition for review | |
03/13/2002 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of BP Amoco et al. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/2002 | Case Stored | G02/22-G-4 | | |
06/04/2002 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the court of appeals. | | |
04/18/2002 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Filing granted | The joint motion to dismiss is granted. The petition for review is dismissed pursuant to settlement. | |
04/18/2002 | Petition for Review disposed | Dismissed | The joint motion to dismiss is granted. The petition for review is dismissed pursuant to settlement. | |
04/16/2002 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
04/11/2002 | Motion to dismiss application for writ of error | joint motion to dismiss petition for review | | |
03/13/2002 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to petition for review | | |
03/13/2002 | Petition for Review | On behalf of BP Amoco et al. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/06/2002 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Location G02/22-G-4 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BP AMERICA, INC | Petitioner | Ms. Judy Yi-Li Liu |
BP EXPLORATION OPERATING COMPA | Petitioner | Mr. Stephen G. Tipps |
AMOCO PRODUCTION COMPANY | Petitioner | Ms. Jennifer Mary Smith |
BP AMOCO P.L.C. | Petitioner | Mr. Wm. Bruce Stanfill |
BP AMOCO, P.L.C | Petitioner | Mr. Thomas S. Kilbane |
AMERADA HESS CORP. | Petitioner | Mr. N. Terry Adams Jr. |
AMERADA HESS LIMITED | Petitioner | Mr. Edward J. Murphy |
ROWAN COMPANIES, INC. | Respondent | Mr. Michael J. Maloney Mr. A. Glenn Diddel III Mr. Jonathan Erik Axelrad Mr. Frank W. Mitchell Mr. Robert Alan York Ms. Nancy Johnson Hebert Mr. David W. Holman |
ENTERPRISE OIL, P.L.C. | Petitioner | Mr. Joseph D. Cheavens |
AMOCO CORPORATION | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffery Taylor Nobles |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-01-00199-CV
Dismissed, WOJ
RULE 47.7, 06-28-01
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
269th District Court
Harris
Honorable John T. Wooldridge
1999-02626