Case Heading (S-15-0007) | |||||
Case Number: | S-15-0007 | Case Docketed On: | 01/12/2015 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Eighth Judicial District Converse County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901 | ||
Short Title: | HAROLD RICHARD ALBAUGH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | HAROLD RICHARD ALBAUGH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Harold Richard Albaugh | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Patricia Lynn Bennett |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Jenny Lynn Craig |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
01/12/2015 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
01/12/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
01/12/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
02/23/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
02/23/2015 | Motion - Stay briefing - unopposed | Motion | Stay briefing - unopposed | Final | |
02/25/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/25/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance (Patricia L. Bennett obo Appellant) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/02/2015 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
03/03/2015 | Order - Stay briefing - Order Granting Motion to Stay Briefing | Order | Stay briefing | Final | |
03/05/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief. No action necessary, case stayed. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/12/2015 | Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Motion | Dismiss - voluntary with waiver | Final | |
03/16/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Waiver of Appeal, Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal; and received proposed Order | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/16/2015 | Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Order | Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated | Final | |
03/16/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |