Case Information: 84-CM-1366 | |||
Short Caption: | MORRISON, MARK UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M6455-84 | Filed Date: | 10/12/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/12/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 12/03/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 04/22/1988 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/02/1988 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/28/1988 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N | |||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | MORRISON, MARK AKA AARON J. MORRISON UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 MS: ATTEMPTING TO TAKE PROP. NOTE - 01 W/O RIGHT | |||
10/12/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/23/1984 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT GREENSPAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/03/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
12/03/1984 | RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 121284 SCHPRD R | |||
01/24/1985 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (11 PGS - TARCZA) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/05/1987 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (144 PGS. - BOWMAN) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/24/1987 | ORDER APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS; APLE BR DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 043087 SCHPRD RT | |||
09/04/1987 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (178 - MAJORS) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/06/1987 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 4TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100387 SCHPRD BA EXTDTE 110487 | |||
11/04/1987 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/3/87 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 110487 SCHPRD BA | |||
11/24/1987 | ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/3/87 (NFX) SL PANELPY SCDATE 111687 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
12/03/1987 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 120387 SCHPRD BA | |||
01/13/1988 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEB 4TH (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 010788 SCHPRD BE | |||
02/09/1988 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 3RD JB PANEL SCDATE 020488 SCHPRD BE | |||
02/11/1988 | LETTER FROM APPELLANT CONSENTING TO APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXT. OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/02/1988 | ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 3/3/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022588 SCHPRD X | |||
03/04/1988 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 23, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 030388 SCHPRD BE | |||
03/22/1988 | ORDER GRT APLE'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FILE BRF TO 3/23/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 031688 SCHPRD OPA | |||
03/23/1988 | APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 31, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 032388 SCHPRD BE | |||
04/05/1988 | APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLH (PB) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/05/1988 | RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/22/1988 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/22/1988 | APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/25/1988 | APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT TO MAY 10TH (NO OPPO) JB (PB) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/10/1988 | APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT TO MAY 19TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 051088 SCHPRD RBA | |||
05/19/1988 | APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 5/31/88 (NO OPE) GT PB PANEL SCDATE 051988 SCHPRD RBA | |||
05/31/1988 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 053188 SCHPRD RBA | |||
11/02/1988 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
11/02/1988 | SUBMITTED PANELNWSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/03/1988 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT APPEALED FROM PANELNWSTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/03/1988 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
11/28/1988 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |