Case: 01-98-01379-CV
01-98-01379-CV
12/21/1998
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
In Re: Bank One, Colorado N.A.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/28/1999 | Letter to counsel per from Clerk per Court | | |
04/22/1999 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
04/22/1999 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
04/21/1999 | Submitted | | |
04/21/1999 | Submission | | |
04/21/1999 | Submitted | | |
03/09/1999 | Exhibits filed | | |
03/09/1999 | Reporter's record filed (statement of facts) | | |
03/05/1999 | Brief received only-oral argument requested | | |
02/24/1999 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
02/09/1999 | Case reinstated | | |
02/09/1999 | Motion was disposed | Grant motion | |
02/09/1999 | Case reinstated | | |
02/05/1999 | Motion filed | | |
01/21/1999 | Opinion issued | Abate case | |
12/22/1998 | Case reinstated | | |
12/22/1998 | Correspondence | | |
12/22/1998 | Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec | | |
12/22/1998 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
12/22/1998 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
12/21/1998 | Exhibits filed | | |
12/21/1998 | Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec | | |
12/21/1998 | Motion filed | | |
12/21/1998 | Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus | | |
12/21/1998 | Original proceeding filing fee paid. | | |
12/21/1998 | Submitted | | |
12/21/1998 | Submission | | |
12/21/1998 | Submitted | | |
12/21/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/22/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
FSB PROPERTIES, INC. | Real party in interest | William T. Powell |
JUDGE, TRIAL | Respondent | Hon. Catherine Stone |
IN RE: BANK ONE, COLORADO N.A | Relator | Alton Hall, Jr. The Honorable George C. Hanks Jr. |
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
Honorable Kathleen S Stone
9456152