Case Information: 84-CM-1262 | |||
Short Caption: | VALINDA C. JONES V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | D2680-83 | Filed Date: | 09/05/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/05/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 07/09/1986 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 12/22/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 04/21/1987 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Valinda C. Jones | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | Valinda C. Jones | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | District of Columbia | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | JONES, VALDA C. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | |||
01/01/1906 | JONESV VACATED - 1/18/85 MERKOWITZM VACATED 7/10/85 | |||
09/05/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
07/09/1986 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
12/22/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
04/21/1987 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
04/23/1987 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |