Case: 97-0825
97-0825
09/15/1997
application for writ of error granted by Court
LYNDA GAIL AUSTIN
HEALTHTRUST, INC. - THE HOSPITAL COMPANY, WHARTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION d/b/a GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER and PATRICK LILLEY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/28/1998 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | "Brief of Respondents on the Merits" Orig + 11 | |
01/23/1998 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | on behalf of The Texas Employment Law Council by W. Christopher Hahn @ 600 Congress Ave., Suite 2700, Austin TX 78701 (512)495-8400 | |
01/14/1998 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | on behalf of Edwin A. Melendez, Sr. by Robert Fugate @ 204 S. 4th Ave., Mansfield, Tx. 76063 (817)473-8883 | |
09/30/1997 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/15/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | on behalf of Lynda Gail Austin | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/16/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date. | | |
06/16/1998 | Mandate issued | 967 SW2d 400 | | |
04/14/1998 | Concurring Opinion issued. | concurring opinion by Justice Gonzalez joined by Justice Spector | | |
04/14/1998 | Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of record | judgment issued | | |
04/14/1998 | Opinion issued | Court of Appeals' judgment affirmed | CA judgment is affirmed. Opin. by PRO w/TRP, NLH, CTE, JAB, GA, DGH. Concurring opinion by RAG joined by RS 967 SW2d 400 | |
04/14/1998 | Opinion issued | Court of Appeals' judgment affirmed | CA judgment is affirmed. Opin. by PRO w/TRP, NLH, CTE, JAB, GA, DGH. Concurring opinion by RAG joined by RS 967 SW2d 400 | |
02/03/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submission date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submission info. | | |
02/03/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the submitted date of a process | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive submitted date. | | |
02/03/1998 | Oral argument | argued for petitioner by Gregg M. Rosenberg for respondents by Chad A. Shultz | ||
01/29/1998 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing granted | motion to participate by non-resident attorney (Schultz) is granted | |
01/29/1998 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing granted | motion to participate as non-resident attorney is granted for Ortega | |
01/28/1998 | Brief on the Merits | "Brief of Respondents on the Merits" Orig + 11 | | |
01/28/1998 | Notice requesting filing fee | $10 fee for Brief from Atty Elizabeth Ortega | | |
01/23/1998 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | on behalf of The Texas Employment Law Council by W. Christopher Hahn @ 600 Congress Ave., Suite 2700, Austin TX 78701 (512)495-8400 | | |
01/14/1998 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion to admit out of state atty - Schultz Pro Hac Vice (incorporated with motion pro hac vice of Ortega) | | |
01/14/1998 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion to admit out of state atty - Ortega Pro Hac Vice (incorporated with motion pro hac vice of Schultz) | | |
01/14/1998 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | on behalf of Edwin A. Melendez, Sr. by Robert Fugate @ 204 S. 4th Ave., Mansfield, Tx. 76063 (817)473-8883 | | |
01/14/1998 | Notice requesting filing fee | | | |
10/30/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info. | |
10/30/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date. | |
10/30/1997 | Amount of time allotted for oral argument. | 20/20 minutes to argue | | |
10/30/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Filing granted | Granted on Pt. 1 | |
10/30/1997 | Set for Submission | to be argued 02/03/98 | | |
10/30/1997 | Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals. | | | |
10/07/1997 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
09/30/1997 | Response to Petition | | | |
09/15/1997 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | on behalf of Lynda Gail Austin | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
06/16/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 15-F-4 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
WHARTON HOSPITAL CORPORATION | Respondent | Ms. Layne A. Thompson |
HEALTHTRUST, INC.- THE HOSPITA | Respondent | Ms. M. Elizabeth Ortega Ms. Layne A. Thompson |
AUSTIN, LYNDA GAIL | Petitioner | Mr. Ian Scharfman Mr. Gregg M. Rosenberg |
LILLEY, PATRICK | Respondent | Ms. Layne A. Thompson |
GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER | Respondent | Mr. Chad A. Shultz Mr. David N. Goldman |
Court of Appeals Information:
13-95-00574-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
951 SW2d 078, 06-05-97
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable ROBERT J. SEERDEN
Trial Court Information
23rd District Court
Wharton
Honorable Daniel R. Sklar
32,219