Case: 02-97-00495-CR
02-97-00495-CR
09/16/1997
All Misdemeanors
T.K.'s Video, Inc.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/21/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/12/1998 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
03/12/1998 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
03/11/1998 | Submitted | | |
03/11/1998 | Submission | | |
02/13/1998 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
01/23/1998 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/20/1998 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
01/07/1998 | Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed | | |
10/10/1997 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
09/26/1997 | Extension to File Notice of Appeal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/23/1997 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
09/23/1997 | Extension to File Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/16/1997 | Extension to File Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
09/16/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/21/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Kathleen Walsh |
T.k.`s Video, Inc. | Criminal - Appellant | Malcolm Dade |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Denton
Honorable Darlene Alford Whitten
CR-93-03993-C