Case: 01-97-00993-CV
01-97-00993-CV
09/16/1997
Summary judgment
Rathjen, Eric
Mental Health Mental Retardation Authority of Harris County, Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/13/1999 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
10/13/1999 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
06/28/1999 | Correspondence | | |
06/24/1999 | Date Petition for Review Disposed in Supreme Court | Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06) | |
05/10/1999 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |
04/20/1999 | Record has been checked in | | |
04/13/1999 | Date Petition for Review filed in Supeme Court | | |
04/12/1999 | Record has been checked out. | | |
02/25/1999 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
02/25/1999 | Motion for rehearing disposed | Overruled | |
10/02/1998 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
10/02/1998 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
10/01/1998 | Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec | | |
10/01/1998 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |
09/03/1998 | Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp. | Grant motion | |
09/01/1998 | Response filed to a motion or to a Court order | | |
08/20/1998 | Extension of time to file motion for rehearing | | |
08/20/1998 | Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec | | |
08/06/1998 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
08/06/1998 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
05/22/1998 | Letter Brief Filed | | |
05/15/1998 | Correspondence | | |
05/12/1998 | Submitted | | |
05/12/1998 | Submission | | |
05/12/1998 | Submitted | | |
03/18/1998 | Submission | | |
02/09/1998 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
02/09/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/09/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/15/1998 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
01/07/1998 | Brief Due | | |
12/31/1997 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
12/08/1997 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
10/24/1997 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
10/10/1997 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
09/26/1997 | Docketing statement filed | | |
09/25/1997 | Docketing statement filed | | |
09/22/1997 | Appellate filing fee paid. | | |
09/16/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/13/1997 | Record due | | |
09/11/1997 | Transcript filed | | |
08/11/1997 | Appeal bond filed | | |
06/12/1997 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |
05/16/1997 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/13/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | |
REPORTER, COURT | Other interested party | |
District Clerk, District | District clerk | |
MENTAL HEALTH MENTAL RETARDATI | Appellee | David M. Feldman Sheila P Haddock Robert Peter Scamardo |
RATHJEN, ERIC | Appellant | William B. Connolly |
Trial Court Information
270th District Court
Harris
9606639