judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-1045
A-1045
10/21/1946
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY
MRS. NELLIE BURDEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/14/1947Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/29/1947Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/09/1947Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/01/1946Response to PetitionRespondent
10/21/1946Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/14/1947Motion for Rehearing
07/29/1947Motion for Rehearing
07/14/1947Motion to Argue filedOverruled
07/09/1947Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/25/1947Dissenting opinion issued.
06/25/1947Opinion issued
04/16/1947Letter Filed
12/10/1946Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
12/06/1946Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
11/20/1946Document received (See Remarks)
11/01/1946Response to Petition
10/30/1946Additional Copies received
10/21/1946Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/21/1946Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Nellie BurdenRespondent
Texas and New Orleans Railroad CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information