Case: 14-99-00033-CR
14-99-00033-CR
01/13/1999
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Warnecke, William Gary
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/03/2001 | Case stored | | |
01/30/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/30/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/29/2001 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
01/29/2001 | Extend time to file PDR DISPOSED | DENIED | |
01/26/2001 | Record RETURNED from Higher Court | | |
01/17/2001 | Extend time to file PDR DISPOSED | DENIED | |
01/17/2001 | Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSED | REFUSED | |
01/04/2001 | Record Sent | | |
01/03/2001 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
12/19/2000 | No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
12/19/2000 | Petition for Discretionary Review FILED | | |
12/11/2000 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
12/05/2000 | Extend time to file PDR DISPOSED | DENIED | |
11/09/2000 | Mtn.for en banc consideration DISPOSED-APE,ANT | DENIED | |
10/23/2000 | Mtn.for en banc consideration FILED-ANT,APE | | |
10/23/2000 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
09/21/2000 | Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STA | OVERRULED | |
09/11/2000 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |
08/31/2000 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP | GRANTED | |
08/31/2000 | Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/28/2000 | Motion for rehearing RECEIVED - ANT,APE,PRO SE | | |
08/25/2000 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
08/25/2000 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
08/24/2000 | Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP | | |
08/10/2000 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
08/10/2000 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
08/08/2000 | Submitted | | |
08/08/2000 | Submission | | |
08/08/2000 | Submitted | | |
07/18/2000 | Submission letter 39.8 sent this date | | |
08/02/1999 | State's brief DUE | | |
07/27/1999 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
07/27/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/27/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
06/24/1999 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
06/17/1999 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
06/16/1999 | State's brief DUE | | |
05/17/1999 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
05/17/1999 | Past due brief | | |
05/14/1999 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
04/22/1999 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
04/13/1999 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
04/12/1999 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
03/04/1999 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
02/26/1999 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
02/25/1999 | Clerk's Record DUE | | |
02/25/1999 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
02/25/1999 | Record due | | |
02/11/1999 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |
01/27/1999 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
01/25/1999 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
01/22/1999 | Reporters record FILED - ANT,APP,STA | | |
01/13/1999 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
01/13/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
12/04/1998 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
10/28/1998 | Date of Sentence | | |
10/28/1998 | Motion for new trial FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/30/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Warnecke, William Gary | Criminal - Appellant | Gary Warnecke Greg Russell |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Joel H. Bennett |
Trial Court Information
10th District Court
Galveston
Honorable ISRAEL LERNER
97CR0605
10 yrs TDCJ