judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00488-CR
04-81-00488-CR
12/22/1981
Habeas Corpus
Urrutia, Joseph
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/22/1984Mandate Issued
05/22/1984Mandate Issued
03/30/1984Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
03/30/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/22/1984No Description Available.
02/24/1984Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/24/1984Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/22/1984Motion to Supplement Record Filed
02/22/1984Motion for Leave Filed
02/08/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
02/08/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
07/27/1983Submission
07/27/1983Submitted
07/20/1983Motion for Leave DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1983Motion for Leave Filed
06/06/1983Waives Oral Argument
04/05/1982Case ready to be set
04/05/1982Brief Filed
04/05/1982Case ready to be set
03/22/1982Brief Filed
03/08/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
02/25/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/10/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/03/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/01/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/19/1982No Description Available.
12/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/1981Record Filed
12/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/17/1981Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
12/01/1981Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
11/22/1981Mot. EOT to file Record Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
81-W-0456
N/A