judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BETTY MATHISEN, HAROLD SHIPLEY, PATRICIA BROWN, VICKI RUIZ, BOBBY SHIPLEY, JR., JIMMY SHIPLEY, MONICA MILLER and ROBIN SHIPLEY v. THUNDER BASIN COAL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, JACOBS RANCH COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, CONSOL ENERGY, INC., a Delaware corporation and CONSOLIDATION COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation

Case Heading (06-276)
Case Number:06-276Case Docketed On:12/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:BETTY MATHISEN, HAROLD SHIPLEY, PATRICIA BROWN, VICKI RUIZ, BOBBY SHIPLEY, JR., JIMMY SHIPLEY, MONICA MILLER and ROBIN SHIPLEY v. THUNDER BASIN COAL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, JACOBS RANCH COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, CONSOL ENERGY, INC., a Delaware corporation and CONSOLIDATION COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation
Full Title:BETTY MATHISEN, HAROLD SHIPLEY, PATRICIA BROWN, VICKI RUIZ, BOBBY SHIPLEY, JR., JIMMY SHIPLEY, MONICA MILLER and ROBIN SHIPLEY, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. THUNDER BASIN COAL COMPANY, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, JACOBS RANCH COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, CONSOL ENERGY, INC., a Delaware corporation and CONSOLIDATION COAL COMPANY, a Delaware corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBetty MathisenPatrick Dixon
AppellantHarold ShipleyPatrick Dixon
AppellantPatricia BrownPatrick Dixon
AppellantVicki RuizPatrick Dixon
AppellantBobby Shipley Jr.Patrick Dixon
AppellantJimmy ShipleyPatrick Dixon
AppellantMonica MillerPatrick Dixon
AppellantRobin ShipleyPatrick Dixon
AppelleeThunder Basin Coal Company, LLCThomas John Davidson
AppelleeJacobs Ranch Coal CompanyMark Daniel Taylor
Thomas P. Johnson
Andrea Wang
AppelleeConsolenergy, Inc.Mark Daniel Taylor
Thomas P. Johnson
Andrea Wang
AppelleeConsolidation Coal CompanyMark Daniel Taylor
Thomas P. Johnson
Andrea Wang

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 161
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/01/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/18/2007Brief - Appellants; and received copy on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
03/06/2007Brief - Appellees Jacobs Ranch Coal Company, Consolidation Coal Company and Consol Energy, Inc.; and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
03/06/2007Motion - Admission pro hac vice - Thomas P. Johnson and Andrea Wang on behalf of Jacobs Ranch Coal Company, Consolidation Coal Company and Consol Energy, Inc.MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
03/06/2007Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Thomas P. Johnson and Andrea WangOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
03/06/2007Brief - Appellee Thunder Basin Coal Company; and received copy of brief on disk on 03/08/07.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/22/2007Brief - Appellants reply; and received copy on disk.BriefAppellant replyFinal
03/23/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/03/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick DixonNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2007Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
04/23/2007Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
05/22/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas P. Johnson for Jacobs Ranch Coal, Consol Energy and Consolidation Coal Co.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/25/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Dixon for appellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas J. Davidson for Thunder Basin CoalNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
06/13/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick Dixon for appellants; Thomas P. Johnson, Thomas J. Davidson, Andrea Wang and Mark Taylor, argument by Messrs. Johnson and Davidson for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/13/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/30/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/30/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/30/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/05/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/1/07 by Greta Evans.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal