judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAMEY (ERIC) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34668
Short Caption:RAMEY (ERIC) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990896Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07579
08/17/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 16, 1999. Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 99-07677
09/03/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting the Court to Direct the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to Forward the Letters Contained in the Confidential Envelope in CR99-0896. 99-08286
09/03/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08287
09/03/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-08289
09/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the district court is directed to forward a copy of the letters contained in the confidential envelope from district court case number CR99-0896 for filing and consideration with the appendix. 99-08674
09/17/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Certified Copies of Original Sealed Documents. 99-08846
09/24/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Suspend Briefing Schedule and to Remand for Clarification of the Record. 99-09111
11/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. On September 24, 1999, the state filed a motion to suspend the briefing schedule and to remand for clarification of the record. We conclude it is not necessary to remand this case for clarification of the record. The state shall have 20 days in which to show cause why this case should not be remanded to the district court for a new sentencing hearing before a different district judge. All deadlines pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court. 99-11384
12/07/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-12260
01/19/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court with instructions to vacate appellant's sentence and hold a new sentencing hearing before a different district court judge." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00849
02/15/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-02362
02/15/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 17, 2000. 00-02362