Case: 02-94-00479-CR
02-94-00479-CR
11/07/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Nickles, Joe Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/08/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
11/30/1995 | Motion to Abate Appeal | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/30/1995 | Opinion issued | Abated | |
11/30/1995 | Submitted | | |
11/30/1995 | Submission | | |
10/31/1995 | Motion to Abate Appeal | | |
07/06/1995 | Brief Filed | | |
02/06/1995 | Exhibits Filed | | |
02/06/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
02/06/1995 | No Description Available. | | |
02/06/1995 | Submission | | |
11/07/1994 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/07/1994 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/08/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Tim Curry |
Nickles, Joe Lee | Criminal - Appellant | Pamela J. Lakatos |
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Robert K. Gill
0405485D
4 YRS IDTDCJ/$10,000 FINE