judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

POWELL, WILLIAM A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CM-1252
Short Caption:POWELL, WILLIAM A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead: 83-CM-1103 Consolidated:83-CM-1252
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M10059-82Filed Date:10/06/1983

Opening Event Date:10/06/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/10/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/26/1986
Argued/Submitted:06/02/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John P. RacinYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary Ellen Abrecht YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901POWELL, WILLIAM A. UNITED STATES
10/06/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/10/1985FiledRecord Completed
03/26/1986FiledBriefing Completed
06/02/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/18/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition