Case Information: 36977 | |||
Short Caption: | CHESTNUTT VS. FREEMAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D231140 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/09/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
11/09/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-19747 | |
11/09/2000 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | ||
11/27/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Eugenia Matos--check no. 0652. | ||
01/03/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. The notice of appeal was filed before the entry of a formal written order. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We note that appellant mayu file a new notice of appeal within the timer permitted by NRAP 4(a)(1) after a written order has been entered by the district court.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-00135 | |
01/30/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-00635 | |
01/30/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/13/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 6, 2001. | 01-00635 |