Case: 03-98-00624-CV
03-98-00624-CV
11/12/1998
Plea to jurisdiction
Jerry Hoskins
Smithville Independent School District and Michael Moses, Commissioner of Education
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/15/2012 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
10/15/2001 | CASE STORED | | |
02/10/2000 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Dismissed | |
02/03/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/27/2000 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
01/27/2000 | miscellaneous motion disp | Dismissed | |
12/23/1999 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/20/1999 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | | |
12/02/1999 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/29/1999 | Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. Review | | |
10/14/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
10/01/1999 | Motion for rehearing filed | | |
09/16/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
08/31/1999 | list of additional authorities | | |
04/14/1999 | Submitted | | |
04/14/1999 | Submission | | |
03/23/1999 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
03/08/1999 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |
03/04/1999 | Reply brief filed | | |
03/03/1999 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |
03/02/1999 | Oral argument acknowledged | | |
02/26/1999 | Submission | | |
02/19/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/16/1999 | Brief filed | | |
02/12/1999 | Brief filed | | |
01/14/1999 | Supplemental Clerk's Record Filed | | |
01/14/1999 | Brief filed | | |
12/17/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
11/19/1998 | Staff recommendation for mediation | No for mediation | |
11/18/1998 | Docketing statement received | | |
11/18/1998 | Response to Motion | | |
11/12/1998 | Docketing statement received | | |
11/12/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
11/12/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/03/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hoskins, Jerry | Appellant | Mr. Gregory D. Sherwood Mr. Thomas W. George |
Moses, Commissioner, Michael O | Appellee | The Honorable Dan Morales Mr. George A. Warner |
Smithville Independent School | Appellee | Mr. Eric W. Schulze Mr. Paul W. Hunn |
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Bastrop
Honorable John L. Placke
22,264