judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAMPBELL VS. DEAN

Case Information: 34684
Short Caption:CAMPBELL VS. DEANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A337768Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/31/1999 / Galatz, NeilSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/19/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Allstate--check no. 73432018.
08/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07723
08/31/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Neil Galatz. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/15/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-12698
01/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-00650
01/18/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-00737
02/09/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 00-02085
02/09/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.