judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHANE SANDERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-14)
Case Number:06-14Case Docketed On:01/20/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:SHANE SANDERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SHANE SANDERSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShane SandersonMichael J. Krampner
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 127
Citation:165 P.3d 83

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/20/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/20/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/21/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/30/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/12/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/06/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Appellant's copy of designation of record.Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/02/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, five volumes. Volumes I and II, original papers; volume III, transcripts; volume IV, exhibits; volume V, confidential records.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/11/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/17/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael J. Krampner for appellant; David L. Delicath, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/17/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/06/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/22/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/22/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/22/2007Event - Phone Call. Spoke with Mr. Krampner regarding can of starter fluid that was sent to us with exhibits. He stated that he can't see any reason why we couldn't dispose of it. It was described in great detail in the transcripts and also believes there are pictures of it as well in the exhibits.EventPhone CallFinal
08/22/2007Event - Phone Call. Spoke with Thelma Axberg regarding physical exhibits. She stated that we could dispose of the KY Jelly and also the can of starter fluid, as there are pictures admitted into evidence.EventPhone CallFinal
08/24/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/23/07 by Mina S. Stewart.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal