judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WASHINGTON GAS LIGHT COMPANY PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION

Case Information: 81-AA-0302
Short Caption:WASHINGTON GAS LIGHT COMPANY PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Lead:81-AA-0302Consolidated: 81-AA-0303 , 81-AA-0305
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:03/12/1981

Opening Event Date:03/12/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/13/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/17/1981
Argued/Submitted:09/01/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentJohn Doe N
Dwight G. Duncan NN
Intervenor-RespondentJohn Doe N
Edward A. Caine NN
PetitionerJohn Doe N
Lewis Carroll NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Lloyd N. Moore NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WASHINGTON GAS LIGHT COMPANY PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION
03/12/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/13/1981FiledRecord Completed
07/17/1981FiledBriefing Completed
09/01/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/30/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition