judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HARTMAN HALL v. O. C. WHITAKER COMPANY

Case: A-209
A-209
06/01/1944
Application for Writ of Error
HARTMAN HALL
O. C. WHITAKER COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/07/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/24/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/22/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
06/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/23/1945Letter Filed
03/10/1945Additional Copies receivedOverruled
03/07/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/24/1945Motion for RehearingFiling granted
11/22/1944Response to Petition
10/25/1944Bond
10/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/09/1944Additional Copies receivedFiling granted
06/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
O. C. Whitaker CompanyRespondent
Hartman HallPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information