judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-3087
A-3087
03/15/1951
Application for Writ of Error
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
W. A. QUERNER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/04/1951Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
10/03/1951Errata FiledAmicus Curiae
10/02/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/17/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/04/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/10/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/02/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/08/1951Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/20/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/20/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/19/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/19/1951Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/18/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/23/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
03/15/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/04/1951Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
10/03/1951Errata Filed
10/02/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/17/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
09/04/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/10/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/02/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/18/1951Opinion issued
06/08/1951Motion for extension of time to argue. See remarksDenied
05/16/1951Document received (See Remarks)
05/08/1951Reply to Response
04/30/1951Response to Motion filed
04/20/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/20/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/19/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/19/1951Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/18/1951Motion for RehearingFiling granted
03/23/1951Response to Petition
03/15/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/15/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Petitioner
Common Carrier Motor Freight Association IncorporatedAmicus Curiae
Brown Express, et al.Amicus Curiae
Rail and Motor CarriersAmicus Curiae
Hill Lines, Inc.Amicus Curiae
W. A. QuernerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information