judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-3112
A-3112
03/27/1951
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. ETTIE MAE WADE, ET AL.
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/10/1951Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/06/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
03/27/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/05/1951Opinion issued
06/27/1951Document received (See Remarks)
06/27/1951Document received (See Remarks)
06/27/1951Document received (See Remarks)
04/10/1951Supplemental Brief filed
04/06/1951Response to Petition
03/27/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/27/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationRespondent
Mrs. Ettie Mae Wade, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information