judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-3138
A-3138
04/10/1951
Application for Writ of Error
PARKER PETROLEUM COMPANY
PRESTON LAWS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/26/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/30/1951Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/20/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
04/10/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/26/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/11/1951Opinion issued
05/30/1951Supplemental Brief filed
05/09/1951Document received (See Remarks)
05/09/1951Document received (See Remarks)
04/20/1951Response to Petition
04/10/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/10/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Parker Petroleum CompanyPetitioner
Preston LawsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information