judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-3127
A-3127
04/04/1951
Application for Writ of Error
WASH STORM, ET AL.
MAGNOLIA PETROLEUM COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/16/1951Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/10/1951Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/06/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
04/04/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/21/1951Response to Motion filed
05/16/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/10/1951Reply to Response
04/06/1951Response to Petition
04/04/1951Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/04/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Magnolia Petroleum Company, et al.Respondent
Wash Storm, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information