judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HERNANDEZ-MURILLO VS. STATE

Case Information: 34683
Short Caption:HERNANDEZ-MURILLO VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P1906Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/21/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07714
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34429, 34579, 34587, 34683, 34696, 34700, 34713, 34762. 99-09647
10/21/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 99-10322
10/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. The state shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why we should not remand this appeal to the district court to vacate the conviction and sentence for battery. 01-17846
11/19/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-19344
12/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. fn11[On October 23, 2001, we ordered the State to show cause why this case should not be remanded for the district court to vacate the conviction and sentence for battery. In response, the State indicates that it is not opposed to a remand for this purpose.] fn12[We also reject Hernandez-Murillo's claim that cumulative error warrants reversal of his conviction.] fn13[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter. We conclude that Hernandez-Murillo is entitled only to the relief described herein. This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20656
01/07/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20825
01/07/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 01-20825