judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

QWEST CORPORATION v. THE PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION OF WYOMING, STEVE FURTNEY, CHAIRMAN, KATHLEEN LEWIS, DEPUTY CHAIRMAN, and MARY BYRNES, COMMISSIONER and SILVER STAR COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

Case Heading (06-102)
Case Number:06-102Case Docketed On:05/05/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Public Utilities (Title 37)
Short Title:QWEST CORPORATION v. THE PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION OF WYOMING, STEVE FURTNEY, CHAIRMAN, KATHLEEN LEWIS, DEPUTY CHAIRMAN, and MARY BYRNES, COMMISSIONER and SILVER STAR COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Full Title:QWEST CORPORATION, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION OF WYOMING, STEVE FURTNEY, CHAIRMAN, KATHLEEN LEWIS, DEPUTY CHAIRMAN, and MARY BYRNES, COMMISSIONER, Appellee (Respondent), and SILVER STAR COMMUNICATIONS, INC., Appellee (Intervenor).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantQuest CorporationPaul J. Hickey
Roger Fransen
Barbara J. Brohl
AppelleePublic Service CommissionPatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Ryan T. Schelhaas
Stephanie Faith Marquiss Anesi
AppelleeSilver Star Communications, Inc.James Kendall Sanderson
Bruce S. Asay
Other Particpants
Amicus curiaePublic Service Commission - Consumer Advocate DivisionChristopher B. Petrie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 97
Citation:161 P.3d 495

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/05/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/05/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
05/05/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/16/2006Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
06/30/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
08/16/2006Notice-Incoming - Other; Silver Star Communications, Inc. attempted to file a brief of appellee--not a party. According to district court clerk, a motion to intervene was file in district court, but no order entered allowing intervention.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
08/17/2006Brief - Appellee, Wyoming Public Service Commission; received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/17/2006Notice-Internal - Other; Per Chief Justice, brief from Silver Star, Inc. will not be filed. Contacted counsel, advised he can motion the Court to intervene. Will do so, holding brief until motion filed and decided.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
08/17/2006Motion - Intervene by Silver Star Communications.MotionInterveneFinal
08/28/2006Motion - Amicus - leave to participate; Wyoming Office of Consumer AdvocateMotionAmicus - leave to participateFinal
09/01/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal. Advised counsel for appellant out of state counsel not admitted pro hac vice.Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/06/2006Order - Grant Silver Star Communication, Inc.'s status as a party to this appealOrderGrantFinal
09/06/2006Brief - Appellee Silver Star Communications Inc.BriefAppelleeFinal
09/07/2006Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellant regarding time to file reply brief.EventPhone CallFinal
09/08/2006Event - Phone Call; returned and indicated reply could be filed within 15 days of filing of Silver Star Communication's brief.EventPhone CallFinal
09/12/2006Record - Supplemental record on appeal, three volumes; Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II - III, Agency Record.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
09/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/22/2006Order - Amicus - grant participation Wyoming Office of Consumer Advocate.OrderAmicus - grant participationFinal
09/22/2006Brief - Amicus curiae Wyoming Office of Consumer AdvocateBriefAmicus curiaeFinal
10/03/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/23/2006Correspondence - Incoming; counsel for appellant requests case second argued.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/31/2006Motion - Admission pro hac vice; Quest Corporation's certificate of compliance with Rule 11MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
10/31/2006Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance Barbara J. BrohlNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
11/01/2006Order - Pro hac vice - allow Barbara J. Brohl to appear on behalf of appellant.OrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
11/15/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before a full court (Paul J Hickey, Roger Fransen and Barbara Brohl, argument by Mr. Hickey for appellant; Ryan Schelhass, Sr Asst AG and Stephanie Anesi, Asst AG and James K. Sanderson, Argument by Ms. Anesi and Mr. Sanderson for appellees); taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/15/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/07/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary as mootMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
06/19/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/27/2007Order - Denying motion to dismiss appeal as moot.OrderDenyFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/06/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/06/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/12/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2). Record (2 boxes) signed for 7/9/07 by Julie Taylor.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal