Case Information: 80-TX-1102 | |||
Short Caption: | DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PIERCE ASSOCIATES INC. | Classification: | Appeals - Tax - Tax |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | TAX2785 | Filed Date: | 09/17/1980 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/17/1980 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 01/30/1981 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/01/1981 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/20/1981 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PIERCE ASSOCIATES INC. | |||
09/17/1980 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
01/30/1981 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/01/1981 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
10/20/1981 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
06/16/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |