judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ATTAWAY, KEVIN L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CM-1322
Short Caption:ATTAWAY, KEVIN L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Lead: 83-CM-1085 Consolidated:83-CM-1322
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1099-83Filed Date:11/07/1983

Opening Event Date:11/07/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/27/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/26/1984
Argued/Submitted:11/29/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Allie J. Sheffield YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Edward C. Mcguire YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ATTAWAY, KEVIN L. UNITED STATES
11/07/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/27/1984FiledRecord Completed
09/26/1984FiledBriefing Completed
11/29/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/27/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition