judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-3133
A-3133
04/06/1951
Application for Writ of Error
CLAUDE SPRATLING, ET AL.
W. K. BUTLER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/28/1951Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/28/1951Brief on the MeritsRespondent
04/16/1951Response to PetitionRespondent
04/06/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/28/1951Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/13/1951Opinion issued
05/28/1951Brief on the Merits
04/25/1951Document received (See Remarks)
04/25/1951Document received (See Remarks)
04/25/1951Document received (See Remarks)
04/16/1951Response to Petition
04/06/1951Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/06/1951Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. K. ButlerRespondent
Claude Spratling, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information