Case Information: 38943 | |||
Short Caption: | BJORNSON VS. FERRARI-LUND REALTY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0104875 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/18/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from John Eric Bjornson--Bank of the West M.O. no. 2470958976. | ||
12/18/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-21319 | |
01/02/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. 'ORDER this appeal DISMISSED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-00032 | |
01/04/2002 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Received courtesy copies of proper person documents. | ||
02/08/2002 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although appellants were not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from them, and deny any relief requested therein as moot in light of this order.] fn3[The clerk of this court shall issue the remittitur forthwith.] SNP02--CY/DA/ML | 02-02528 | |
02/08/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-02529 | |
02/08/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/21/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 13, 2002. | 02-03288 |