Case Information: 36985 | |||
Short Caption: | JORGENSEN VS. SPORTS HEALTH, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A411245 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 11/17/2000 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/13/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/13/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. | 00-19798 | |
11/17/2000 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
01/24/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: February 26, 2001. | 01-01569 | |
03/05/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Attorneys and parties have continued to negotiate and hope to reach settlement in about 30 days or sooner. | 01-03970 | |
05/07/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Attorneys and parties are continuing to negotiate and hope to reach settlement in about 45 days. | 01-07647 | |
06/22/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: after July 3rd when the matter will be on the agenda for final approval by Clark County. | 01-10592 | |
07/17/2001 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 01-12133 | |
08/09/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 01-13482 | |
11/21/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 01-19613 | |
12/12/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b) SNP/CLK | 01-20810 | |
12/12/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |